UT SCR012 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-11 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Responsible Development of Public Lands Concurrent Resolution
Title
Responsible Development of Public Lands Concurrent Resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-11 | Senate/ filed in SFILE | |
2010-03-11 | House/ strike enacting clause in SSEC | |
2010-03-10 | House/ under suspension of the rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-09 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-08 | Senate/ to House with amendments in HCLERK | |
2010-03-08 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTWED | |
2010-03-02 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTWED | |
2010-03-02 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTWED | |
2010-03-02 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTWED | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |