UT SCR010 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Urging Solutions for the Central Wasatch Mountains
Title
Concurrent Resolution Urging Solutions for the Central Wasatch Mountains
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House/ failed (Y: 35 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 20 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ failed in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ uncircled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-14 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-03-08 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-08 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-08 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-02-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Federal Government
Government Operations (State Issues)
Interlocal Cooperation Entities
Land Use
Local Governments
Public Lands
Resolutions
Transportation
Government Operations (State Issues)
Interlocal Cooperation Entities
Land Use
Local Governments
Public Lands
Resolutions
Transportation