UT SCR008 | 2020 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-01 - Governor Declined to Sign in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 20 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-01 - Governor Declined to Sign in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution in Support of the Chinese People Regarding the Coronavirus Outbreak
Title
Concurrent Resolution in Support of the Chinese People Regarding the Coronavirus Outbreak
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Governor Declined to Sign in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2020-03-28 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2020-03-28 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-20 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-16 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-16 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-12 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2020-03-12 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-12 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-12 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-11 | House | House/ 3rd Reading Calendar to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2020-03-09 | House | House/ comm rpt/ amended in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-06 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-06 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2020-02-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2020-02-25 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-25 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2020-02-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |