UT SCR008 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-15 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Supporting New Technologies and Facilities That Enhance the Production and Value of Uintah Black Wax
Title
Concurrent Resolution Supporting New Technologies and Facilities That Enhance the Production and Value of Uintah Black Wax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-15 | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ Consent Calendar in SSUB | |
2012-02-13 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTNAE | |
2012-02-13 | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTNAE | |
2012-02-13 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTNAE | |
2012-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTNAE | |
2012-02-10 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTNAE | |
2012-02-09 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-09 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-09 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-02-08 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-08 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-08 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SCR008.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2012/bills/sbillint/scr008.pdf |