UT SCR006 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 3 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-03 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Approving Classification of Solid Waste Facility Solid Waste Permit
Title
Concurrent Resolution Approving Classification of Solid Waste Facility Solid Waste Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-03 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2010-02-26 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-25 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-02-25 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-02-25 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2010-02-22 | House/ 2nd reading in HCON | |
2010-02-22 | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTPOL | |
2010-02-17 | House/ to standing committee in HSTPOL | |
2010-02-16 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in SCON | |
2010-02-10 | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON | |
2010-02-09 | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTNAE | |
2010-02-09 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTNAE | |
2010-02-08 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTNAE | |
2010-02-08 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTNAE | |
2010-02-03 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2010-02-02 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2010-02-02 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |