UT SCR005 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Edward T. Alter for His Service as Utah State Treasurer
Title
Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Edward T. Alter for His Service as Utah State Treasurer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2019-03-19 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-01 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-03-01 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-02-28 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2019-02-28 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2019-02-28 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2019-02-28 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2019-02-28 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Special Orders Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | House/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in House Special Orders Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-13 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-13 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate Special Orders Calendar |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in Senate Special Orders Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-01-25 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-01-23 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-01-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |