UT SCR005 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution to Change Utah's Designated Time Zone and Observance of Daylight Saving Time
Title
Concurrent Resolution to Change Utah's Designated Time Zone and Observance of Daylight Saving Time
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 1 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-01-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-01-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |