UT SCR005 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-05 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Encouraging Parental Engagement in the Education of Children
Title
Concurrent Resolution Encouraging Parental Engagement in the Education of Children
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-24 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-22 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2012-02-29 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2012-02-29 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2012-02-28 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2012-02-28 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2012-02-27 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-27 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-27 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-02-27 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2012-02-24 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-02-24 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-02-24 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2012-02-23 | House/ placed on Time Certain Calendar in HSPEC | |
2012-02-23 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2012-02-23 | House/ 2nd reading in H3RDSB | |
2012-02-23 | House/ committee report favorable in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-22 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-16 | House/ to standing committee in HSTEDU | |
2012-02-16 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-15 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2012-02-14 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2012-02-14 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2012-02-07 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-02-07 | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTEDU | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTEDU | |
2012-02-03 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDU | |
2012-02-01 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-31 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-31 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-30 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-01-30 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-01-30 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-01-30 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-01-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |