UT SCR005 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate/ uncircled in S2ND
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-08 - Senate/ uncircled in S2ND
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Bear Lake Concurrent Resolution
Title
Bear Lake Concurrent Resolution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-08 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2011-02-08 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-02-01 | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTGOP | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTGOP | |
2011-01-26 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTGOP | |
2011-01-26 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTGOP | |
2011-01-24 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-01-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2011-01-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |