UT SCR003 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-01 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concurrent Resolution Encouraging Support for the Listen and Explain, Cooperate and Communicate Campaign
Title
Concurrent Resolution Encouraging Support for the Listen and Explain, Cooperate and Communicate Campaign
Sponsors
Sen. Wayne Harper [R] | Rep. Ken Ivory [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-17 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-01-20 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2023-02-28 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-02-19 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-19 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-17 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2023-02-17 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2023-02-17 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2023-02-17 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2023-02-17 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2023-02-15 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House Consent Calendar |
2023-02-15 | House | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-13 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-01 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-01 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-01-10 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-12-29 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-12-29 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-12-29 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |