UT SB3003 | 2011 | 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-13 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-10-13 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to Driver License Suspension for Driving Under the Influence Offenses
Title
Amendments to Driver License Suspension for Driving Under the Influence Offenses
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-13 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2011-10-04 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-10-04 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2011-10-04 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2011-10-04 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2011-10-04 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-10-03 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-10-03 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-10-03 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2011-10-03 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-10-03 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-10-03 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2011-10-03 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2011-10-03 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2011-10-03 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2011-10-03 | House/ received from Senate in HINTRO | |
2011-10-03 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2011-10-03 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2011-10-03 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2011-10-03 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-10-03 | Senate/ under suspension of the rules in SSTRUL | |
2011-10-03 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-10-03 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SINTRO | |
2011-10-03 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SINTRO | |
2011-10-03 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-10-03 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-09-29 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC |
Subjects
Bills on the Call
Driving Under the Influence (DUI)
Motor Vehicles
Offenses
Special Session
Transportation
Driving Under the Influence (DUI)
Motor Vehicles
Offenses
Special Session
Transportation
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011S3/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB3003.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011S3/bills/sbillint/sb3003.pdf |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011S3/bills/sbillenr/sb3003.pdf |