UT SB2002 | 2011 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-28 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic Beverage Control Act Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverage Control Act Amendments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-28 Governor Signed in ELTGOV
2011-07-21 Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
2011-07-21 Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC
2011-07-21 Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC
2011-07-21 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2011-07-20 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN
2011-07-20 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN
2011-07-20 Senate/ received from House in SPRES
2011-07-20 House/ to Senate in SPRES
2011-07-20 House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2011-07-20 House/ passed 3rd reading in H3RDSB
2011-07-20 House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB
2011-07-20 House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB
2011-07-20 House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL
2011-07-20 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2011-07-20 House/ received from Senate in HINTRO
2011-07-20 Senate/ to House in HCLERK
2011-07-20 Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK
2011-07-20 Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND
2011-07-20 Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND
2011-07-20 Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND
2011-07-20 Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL
2011-07-20 Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2011-07-20 Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SINTRO
2011-07-20 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SINTRO
2011-07-20 LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SINTRO
2011-07-20 Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2011-07-15 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2011-07-15 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2011-07-15 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback