UT SB0277 | 2023 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water Conservation and Augmentation Amendments
Title
Water Conservation and Augmentation Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2023-03-13 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2023-03-02 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-02 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-01 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2023-03-01 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2023-03-01 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-03-01 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2023-02-28 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-28 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-28 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2023-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2023-02-22 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2023-02-22 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Administrative Rulemaking and Procedures
Agriculture and Food
Department of Agriculture and Food
Department of Natural Resources
Legislative Operations
Natural Resources
New Rulemaking Authority
Sunsets and Repealers
Water
Agriculture and Food
Department of Agriculture and Food
Department of Natural Resources
Legislative Operations
Natural Resources
New Rulemaking Authority
Sunsets and Repealers
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63I | 1 | 273 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 10 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |