UT SB0263 | 2013 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0263S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-11 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Child Care Costs Amendments
Title
Child Care Costs Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in SSUB |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTJLC |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTJLC |
2013-03-06 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTJLC |
2013-03-06 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTJLC |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-03-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-03-01 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-03-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0263S01 (Replaced by) 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV