UT SB0259 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Victim Reparations Fund Amendments
Title
Victim Reparations Fund Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Madsen [R] | Rep. Brian King [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2014-03-20 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-18 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-16 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-13 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SPRES |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ received from Senate in HSPKR |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate/ to House in HSPKR |
2014-03-13 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in HSPKR |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in SSEC |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSEC |
2014-03-13 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSEC |
2014-03-13 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSEC |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SSEC |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in SSEC |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ floor amendment in H3RDSB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in H3RDSB |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2014-03-11 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-03-11 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-07 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-07 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SCON |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTJLC |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-27 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-27 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |