UT SB0255 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation Revisions
Title
Transportation Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ circled in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-03-04 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2022-03-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-01 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-24 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-24 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-24 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |