UT SB0255 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Funding for Education Systems Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funding for Education Systems Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-09SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2017-03-09SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate Secretary
2017-03-09SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2017-03-09HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2017-03-09HouseHouse/ substituted from # 3 to # 6 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2017-03-09HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2017-03-09HouseSenate/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2017-03-09HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2017-03-09HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2017-03-09HouseHouse/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2017-03-08HouseSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee
2017-03-06HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2017-03-06HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2017-03-06HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2017-03-06HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2017-03-06SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2017-03-06SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2017-03-06SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2017-03-03SenateSenate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar
2017-03-03SenateSenate/ substituted from # 1 to # 3 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-03-03SenateSenate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-03-03SenateSenate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-03-03SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-03-01SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2017-03-01SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted/ amended in Senate Education Committee
2017-02-28SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Education Committee
2017-02-28SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Education Committee
2017-02-28SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Education Committee
2017-02-27SenateSenate Comm - Held in Senate Education Committee
2017-02-27SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Education Committee
2017-02-23SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Education Committee
2017-02-22SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2017-02-22SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2017-02-22 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-02-22 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/static/SB0255.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/sbillint/SB0255.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/sbillint/SB0255S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/sbillamd/SB0255S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/sbillint/SB0255S03.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/sbillint/SB0255S06.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2017/SB0255.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2017/SB0255S01.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2017/SB0255S02.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2017/SB0255S04.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2017/SB0255S05.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2017/SB0255S03.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2017/SB0255S06.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=3861
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=3863
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=3867
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2017GS&voteid=1144&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2017GS&voteid=1185&house=S

Bill Comments

feedback