UT SB0252 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-19 - Governor Signed in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to Dentist Practice Act
Title
Amendments to Dentist Practice Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-29 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Governor Signed in LTGOV | |
2012-03-15 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2012-03-15 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2012-03-15 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2012-03-15 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2012-03-06 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-05 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2012-03-05 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-03-05 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2012-03-05 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2012-03-05 | House/ 3rd reading in HCON | |
2012-03-01 | House/ 2nd reading in HCON | |
2012-03-01 | House/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in HSTBUS | |
2012-02-29 | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2012-02-29 | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTBUS | |
2012-02-27 | House/ to standing committee in HSTBUS | |
2012-02-24 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-02-24 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-02-24 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2012-02-24 | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK | |
2012-02-24 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2012-02-23 | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD | |
2012-02-23 | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND | |
2012-02-23 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2012-02-21 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-02-21 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-17 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-16 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-15 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-15 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-02-14 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-14 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-14 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |