UT SB0251 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0251S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Amendments to Medicaid and Health Care
Title
Amendments to Medicaid and Health Care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ substitute adoption failed (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ substitute adoption failed (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in SSUB |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ substitute adoption failed in S2ND |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND |
2014-03-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND |
2014-03-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S2ND |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTHHS |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTHHS |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTHHS |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTHHS |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-26 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-26 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-26 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0251S01 (Replaced by) 2014-03-13 - Senate/ filed in SFILE