UT SB0248 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0248S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Judicial Retention Election Amendments
Title
Judicial Retention Election Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ motion to reconsider (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | House/ substituted in HSUB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ motion to reconsider in HCLERK |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-13 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ uncircled in H3RDSB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ circled in H3RDSB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in H3RDSB |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ 2nd reading in HSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in HSTPOL |
2014-03-07 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in HSTPOL |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ to standing committee in HSTPOL |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-05 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in SCON |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in SCON |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ placed on Consent Calendar in SSTJLC |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTJLC |
2014-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTJLC |
2014-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTJLC |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-25 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-25 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0248S01 (Replaced by) 2014-03-29 - Governor Signed in LTGOV