UT SB0247 | 2022 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Accountable Care Organization Funding Amendments
Title
Accountable Care Organization Funding Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-27 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2022-02-23 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-23 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2022-02-23 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/static/SB0247.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2022/bills/sbillint/SB0247.pdf |