UT SB0246 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Pharmacy Practice Act Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy Practice Act Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24 Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
2017-03-20 Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor
2017-03-20SenateSenate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary
2017-03-17SenateSenate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary
2017-03-17SenateEnrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary
2017-03-07 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2017-03-07 Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2017-03-07 Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling
2017-03-07SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate President
2017-03-07SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate President
2017-03-07SenateHouse/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President
2017-03-07HouseHouse/ received from Senate in House Speaker
2017-03-07HouseSenate/ to House in House Speaker
2017-03-07HouseSenate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker
2017-03-07SenateSenate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar
2017-03-07SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate Secretary
2017-03-07SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2017-03-07SenateHouse/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary
2017-03-07HouseHouse/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2017-03-03HouseHouse/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills
2017-03-03HouseHouse/ comm rpt/ amended in House Health and Human Services Committee
2017-03-02HouseHouse Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Health and Human Services Committee
2017-03-02HouseHouse Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 2 in House Health and Human Services Committee
2017-02-28HouseHouse/ to standing committee in House Health and Human Services Committee
2017-02-28HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2017-02-28HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2017-02-28HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2017-02-28HouseSenate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House
2017-02-28SenateSenate/ 3rd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2017-02-24SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Consent Calendar
2017-02-23SenateSenate/ 2nd reading in Senate Consent Calendar
2017-02-23SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substitute/ amended/ Consent Cal in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2017-02-22SenateSenate Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2017-02-22SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2017-02-22SenateSenate Comm - Amendment Recommendation # 1 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2017-02-22SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2017-02-22SenateSenate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2017-02-22SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2017-02-22SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2017-02-21SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2017-02-21SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2017-02-21SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2017-02-20 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2017-02-20 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/static/SB0246.html
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/sbillint/SB0246.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/sbillint/SB0246S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/sbillamd/SB0246S01.pdf
Texthttp://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/sbillenr/SB0246.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2017/SB0246.fn.pdf
Supplementhttp://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2017/SB0246S01.fn.pdf
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=3350
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=3351
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=3354
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=3355
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2017GS&voteid=810&house=S
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=4110
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=4114
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2017GS&voteid=987&house=H
Roll Callhttp://le.utah.gov/DynaBill/svotes.jsp?sessionid=2017GS&voteid=1253&house=S

Bill Comments

feedback