UT SB0244 | 2013 | Regular Session

Note: Legislation has been replaced by SB0244S01

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Utah Department of Agriculture and Food Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Utah Department of Agriculture and Food Amendments

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-05SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
2013-03-01SenateBill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTNAE
2013-03-01SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTNAE
2013-03-01SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTNAE
2013-03-01SenateLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTNAE
2013-02-28SenateLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTNAE
2013-02-28SenateSenate/ to standing committee in SSTNAE
2013-02-26SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL
2013-02-26SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2013-02-26 LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC
2013-02-26 Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC
2013-02-26 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC

Same As/Similar To

SB0244S01 (Replaced by) 2013-04-01 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback