UT SB0244 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate/ uncircled in S2ND
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate/ uncircled in S2ND
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Salt Lake County Highway Project Funding
Title
Salt Lake County Highway Project Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2011-03-07 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-03-04 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in S2ND | |
2011-03-03 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in S2ND | |
2011-03-03 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTTPT | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTTPT | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-02-28 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |