UT SB0243 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-08 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Construction Trades Licensing Amendments
Title
Construction Trades Licensing Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Mayne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-03-01 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-03-01 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-03-01 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/static/SB0243.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2018/bills/sbillint/SB0243.pdf |