UT SB0241 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sales Tax Distribution Amendments
Title
Sales Tax Distribution Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Comm - Not Considered in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-25 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-25 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 12 | 1102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 1302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 1402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 2103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 2206 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 354 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 802 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 12 | 804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63H | 1 | 205 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |