UT SB0241 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Local Government Plan Review Amendments
Title
Local Government Plan Review Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-09 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2017-03-16 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-10 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-03-10 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-03-09 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2017-03-09 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2017-03-09 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2017-03-09 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2017-03-07 | House | House/ committee report favorable in House Government Operations Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | House Comm - Favorable Recommendation in House Government Operations Committee |
2017-03-03 | House | House Comm - Not Considered in House Government Operations Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-01 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-01 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-27 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-02-17 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-17 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |