UT SB0241 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0241S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-13 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
County Jail Contracting Amendments
Title
County Jail Contracting Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Jenkins [R] | Rep. Brad Dee [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ uncircled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ circled (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ floor amendment (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-13 | House | House/ substituted in HSUB |
2014-03-13 | House | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in H3RDSB |
2014-03-12 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in H3RDSB |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL |
2014-03-10 | House | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | House | Senate/ to House in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in HCLERK |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in S3RD |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S3RD |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in S3RD |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in S2ND |
2014-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTJLC |
2014-02-28 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTJLC |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTJLC |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-25 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-25 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0241S01 (Replaced by) 2014-04-02 - Became Law w/o Governor Signature in LTGOV