UT SB0240 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Property Tax Exemption for Wildfire Prevention
Title
Property Tax Exemption for Wildfire Prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-03-04 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-03-04 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-03-04 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/static/SB0240.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2019/bills/sbillint/SB0240.pdf |
Roll Call | https://le.utah.gov/mtgvotes.jsp?voteid=12974 |