UT SB0240 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Military Installation Development Authority Amendments
Title
Military Installation Development Authority Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2018-03-16 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-13 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-13 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-09 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2018-03-08 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2018-03-08 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-08 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ floor amendment # 4 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ 2nd suspended in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-03-08 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2018-03-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-05 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-05 | House | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 2 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Economic Development and Workforce Services Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2018-02-27 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2018-02-27 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |