UT SB0233 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-09 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Homeowners Association Amendments
Title
Homeowners Association Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2017-02-15 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-15 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2017-02-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/static/SB0233.html |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2017/bills/sbillint/SB0233.pdf |
Supplement | https://le.utah.gov/lfa/fnotes/2017/SB0233.fn.pdf |