UT SB0232 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0232S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-07 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-07 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School Safety Tip Line
Title
School Safety Tip Line
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate/ substituted (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ substituted in SSUB |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTEDU |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTEDU |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU |
2014-02-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTEDU |
2014-02-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTEDU |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDU |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-21 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-21 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-21 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0232S01 (Replaced by) 2014-04-01 - Governor Signed in LTGOV