UT SB0232 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Governor Signed in ELTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Judicial Administration Amendments
Title
Judicial Administration Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Governor Signed in ELTGOV | |
2010-03-19 | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-18 | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in SSEC | |
2010-03-11 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-11 | Senate/ received from House in SPRES | |
2010-03-11 | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-11 | House/ amended out amendment in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-10 | House/ circled in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-10 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-09 | House/ lifted from Rules in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-03 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-02 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ floor amendment in S3RD | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ motion to reconsider passed in SSEC | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-16 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-12 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-11 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-10 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |