UT SB0231 | 2019 | General Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Judicial Discretion in Sentencing Amendments
Title
Judicial Discretion in Sentencing Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2019-02-28 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-28 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2019-02-28 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |