UT SB0231 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Waste Management Amendments
Title
Waste Management Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in Senate Secretary |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2016-02-29 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2016-02-29 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Environment Committee |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2016-02-26 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate | |
2016-02-25 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-02-25 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2016-02-25 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |