UT SB0229 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 21 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-06 - Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Transportation Funding Revisions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation Funding Revisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-06 - Senate - Senate/ override Governor's veto (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-06 - House - House/ override Governor's veto (Y: 50 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-06 Senate/ to Lieutenant Governor in LTGOV
2011-05-06 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2011-05-06 House/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in HCLERK
2011-05-06 Senate/ to House in HCLERK
2011-05-06 Senate/ placed back on 3rd Reading Calendar in S3RD
2011-03-22 LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in EGOV
2011-03-21 Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
2011-03-21 Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC
2011-03-15 Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN
2011-03-11 Senate/ to House in HSPKR
2011-03-11 Senate/ received from House in SPRES
2011-03-10 House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in SPRES
2011-03-10 Senate/ to House in HSPKR
2011-03-10 Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in SCURCAL
2011-03-10 House/ to Senate in SSEC
2011-03-10 House/ floor amendment in H3RDSB
2011-03-10 House/ circled in H3RDSB
2011-03-09 House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB
2011-03-03 House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL
2011-03-02 Senate/ to House in HCLERK
2011-03-02 Senate/ uncircled in S3RD
2011-03-02 Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD
2011-03-01 Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND
2011-02-28 Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTTPT
2011-02-24 Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTTPT
2011-02-22 Senate/ to standing committee in SSTTPT
2011-02-22 Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO
2011-02-21 Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC
2011-02-05 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC
2011-02-04 Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback