UT SB0228 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-07 - Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTRUL
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Forfeiture Amendments
Title
Criminal Forfeiture Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-07 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-07 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2011-03-07 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-03-07 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in S2ND | |
2011-03-03 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-03-02 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTTPT | |
2011-03-02 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTTPT | |
2011-03-02 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |