UT SB0225 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Senate/ strike enacting clause in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - Senate/ strike enacting clause in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Personal Injury Protection Arbitration
Title
Personal Injury Protection Arbitration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SFILE | |
2011-03-08 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND | |
2011-03-01 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-28 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-28 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-25 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC | |
2011-02-24 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2011-02-24 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |