UT SB0222 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Official and State Capitol Protection Amendments
Title
Public Official and State Capitol Protection Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 48 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-11 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-04 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-04 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-03 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-03-03 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-03 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ to standing committee in House Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-26 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-26 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Government Operations and Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-19 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Capitol Hill
Constitutional Officers
Department of Public Safety
Government Operations (State Issues)
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Constitutional Officers
Department of Public Safety
Government Operations (State Issues)
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
53 | 1 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
53 | 1 | 114 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |