UT SB0220 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hospital and Health Care Provider Lien Amendments
Title
Hospital and Health Care Provider Lien Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-17 - Senate - Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed (Y: 1 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Senate/ filed in SFILE | |
2012-03-08 | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC | |
2012-03-02 | Senate/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules in SSTRUL | |
2012-03-01 | Senate Comm - Returned to Rules in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-24 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-18 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-17 | Senate Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTHHS | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-02-15 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-02-15 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-02-15 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-15 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |