UT SB0219 | 2019 | General Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Senate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Crisis Response Amendments

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crisis Response Amendments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Comm - Held (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateSenate/ filed in Senate file for bills not passed
2019-03-14SenateSenate/ received from House in Senate Secretary
2019-03-14SenateHouse/ to Senate in Senate Secretary
2019-03-14HouseHouse/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House
2019-03-11HouseLFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee
2019-03-11HouseLFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee
2019-03-08HouseHouse/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee
2019-03-08HouseHouse/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House
2019-03-08HouseSenate/ to House in Clerk of the House
2019-03-08HouseSenate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Clerk of the House
2019-03-08SenateSenate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-03-07SenateSenate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar
2019-03-07SenateSenate/ comm rpt/ substituted in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-07SenateSenate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-07SenateSenate Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 2 in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-04SenateSenate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-03-04SenateSenate Comm - Held in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-28SenateSenate/ to standing committee in Senate Health and Human Services Committee
2019-02-26SenateSenate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee
2019-02-26SenateSenate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate
2019-02-26 Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel
2019-02-26 Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel

Subjects


Utah State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback