UT SB0219 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Nuisance Amendment
Title
Criminal Nuisance Amendment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-19 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2010-03-17 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2010-03-11 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-10 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2010-03-10 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2010-03-10 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2010-03-08 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2010-03-05 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2010-03-05 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2010-03-05 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2010-02-22 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-17 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-17 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-16 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTJLC | |
2010-02-12 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-02-11 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |