UT SB0218 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTREV
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTREV
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Trust Deed Amendments
Title
Trust Deed Amendments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTREV | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Comm - Not Considered in SSTREV | |
2011-02-10 | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in SSTREV | |
2011-02-10 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTREV | |
2011-02-09 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2011-02-08 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-08 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |
Subjects
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0218.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2011/bills/sbillint/sb0218.pdf |