UT SB0217 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Housing and Transit Reinvestment Zone Act
Title
Housing and Transit Reinvestment Zone Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ concurs with House amendment (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-17 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-09 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-09 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ received from Senate in House Speaker |
2021-03-05 | House | Senate/ to House in House Speaker |
2021-03-05 | House | Senate/ concurs with House amendment in House Speaker |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ placed on Concurrence Calendar in Senate Concurrence Calendar |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | Senate | House/ passed 3rd reading in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ substituted from # 1 to # 2 in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-05 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | Senate/ to Printing with fiscal note in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-04 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-26 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-26 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 1 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ uncircled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ circled in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Transportation, Public Utilities, Energy, and Technology Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-19 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-19 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Air Quality
Boards and Committees
Counties
County and Municipal Finance
County Officers
Department of Transportation
Economic Development
Education
Environment
Government Operations (State Issues)
Governor's Office of Economic Development
Housing
Interlocal Agreements
Interlocal Cooperation
Interlocal Entities
Land Use
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Legislative Operations
Legislative Organization
Limited Purpose Local Government Entities
Local Taxation and Fees
Municipal Officers
Municipalities
Open and Public Meetings
Planning and Zoning
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Property Tax
Public Transit
Public Transit Districts
Revenue and Taxation
State Board of Education
Tax Increment Financing
Transit Transportation Investment Fund
Transportation
Transportation Commission
Transportation Funding
Water
Boards and Committees
Counties
County and Municipal Finance
County Officers
Department of Transportation
Economic Development
Education
Environment
Government Operations (State Issues)
Governor's Office of Economic Development
Housing
Interlocal Agreements
Interlocal Cooperation
Interlocal Entities
Land Use
Legislative Committees and Task Forces
Legislative Operations
Legislative Organization
Limited Purpose Local Government Entities
Local Taxation and Fees
Municipal Officers
Municipalities
Open and Public Meetings
Planning and Zoning
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Property Tax
Public Transit
Public Transit Districts
Revenue and Taxation
State Board of Education
Tax Increment Financing
Transit Transportation Investment Fund
Transportation
Transportation Commission
Transportation Funding
Water
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 12 | 103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 1 | 102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 1 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 2 | 124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
72 | 2 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |