UT SB0217 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-08 - House/ substituted in HSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Math Materials Access Improvement Grant
Title
Math Materials Access Improvement Grant
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | House/ substituted in HSUB | |
2012-03-08 | House/ uncircled in H3RDSB | |
2012-03-08 | House/ circled in H3RDSB | |
2012-03-08 | House/ 3rd reading in H3RDSB | |
2012-03-08 | House/ 2nd reading/ suspension in H3RDSB | |
2012-03-08 | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-06 | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-06 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-05 | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-05 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in HSTRUL | |
2012-03-05 | House/ received from Senate in HCLERK | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ to House in HCLERK | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ passed 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in HCLERK | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2012-03-05 | Senate/ comm rpt/ amended in SSTEDU | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTEDU | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Comm - Amendment Recommendation in SSTEDU | |
2012-03-02 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTEDU | |
2012-03-02 | Senate/ lifted from Rules in SSTRUL | |
2012-03-02 | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL | |
2012-03-02 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2012-03-02 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2012-03-02 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-03-02 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2012-02-04 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2012-02-03 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |