UT SB0216 | 2014 | Regular Session
Note: Legislation replaced by SB0216S01
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-27 - Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal Formation Amendments
Title
Municipal Formation Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Karen Mayne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate/ comm rpt/ substituted in SSUB |
2014-02-25 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTBUS |
2014-02-25 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTBUS |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Bill Substituted by Standing Committee in SSTBUS |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Substitute Recommendation in SSTBUS |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2014-02-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2014-02-20 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in LRGC | |
2014-02-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |
Same As/Similar To
SB0216S01 (Replaced by) 2014-03-07 - Senate/ substituted in SSUB
Subjects
County Government
Land Use
Municipal Government
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Townships
Utah Municipal Code
Land Use
Municipal Government
Political Subdivisions (Local Issues)
Townships
Utah Municipal Code
Utah State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/htmdoc/sbillhtm/SB0216.htm |
Text | https://le.utah.gov/~2014/bills/sbillint/sb0216.pdf |