UT SB0216 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Senate/ filed in SFILE
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Water Pollution Task Force
Title
Water Pollution Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ filed in SFILE |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Senate/ strike enacting clause in SSEC |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd Reading Calendar to Rules in SSTRUL |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ circled in S2ND |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in S2ND |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTNAE |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in SSTNAE |
2013-02-26 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTNAE |
2013-02-25 | Senate | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in SSTNAE |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTNAE |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTNAE |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in SSTRUL |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO |
2013-02-20 | LFA/ bill sent to agencies for fiscal input in LRGC | |
2013-02-20 | Numbered Bill Publically Distributed in LRGC | |
2013-02-20 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in LRGC |