UT SB0215 | 2021 | General Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sex Offender Registry Amendments
Title
Sex Offender Registry Amendments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-04 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 40 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Governor Signed in Lieutenant Governor's office for filing | |
2021-03-15 | Senate/ to Governor in Executive Branch - Governor | |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate/ received enrolled bill from Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Returned to House or Senate in Senate Secretary |
2021-03-09 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-09 | Bill Received from Senate for Enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-04 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in Legislative Research and General Counsel / Enrolling | |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate/ received from House in Senate President |
2021-03-04 | Senate | House/ to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-04 | Senate | House/ signed by Speaker/ returned to Senate in Senate President |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ passed 3rd reading in House Speaker |
2021-03-04 | House | House/ 3rd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ 2nd reading in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-03 | House | House/ Rules to 3rd Reading Calendar in House 3rd Reading Calendar for Senate bills |
2021-03-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in House Rules Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | LFA/ fiscal note sent to sponsor in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | House/ received from Senate in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-26 | House | Senate/ to House in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-26 | House | Senate/ passed 3rd reading in Clerk of the House |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ substituted from # 0 to # 2 in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate/ 3rd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ passed 2nd reading in Senate 3rd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ floor amendment # 1 in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate/ 2nd reading in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in Senate 2nd Reading Calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ committee report favorable in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate/ to standing committee in Senate Judiciary, Law Enforcement, and Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ 1st reading (Introduced) in Senate Rules Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in Waiting for Introduction in the Senate |
2021-02-18 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |
2021-02-18 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |
Subjects
Crimes
Department of Corrections
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Offender Registries
Public Safety
Sexual Offenses
Department of Corrections
Judicial Operations
Law Enforcement and Criminal Justice
Offender Registries
Public Safety
Sexual Offenses
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
77 | 41 | 112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
77 | 41 | 113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |