UT SB0215 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - Senate/ uncircled in S2ND
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - Senate/ uncircled in S2ND
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Highway Project Funding - Salt Lake County
Title
Highway Project Funding - Salt Lake County
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Senate/ uncircled in S2ND | |
2010-03-08 | Senate/ 2nd & 3rd readings/ suspension in S2ND | |
2010-03-03 | Senate/ committee report favorable in SSTBUS | |
2010-03-02 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SSTBUS | |
2010-03-02 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTBUS | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTBUS | |
2010-03-01 | Senate/ received bill from Legislative Research in SINTRO | |
2010-03-01 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2010-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |