UT SB0214 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 17 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-17 - Senate/ to Governor in EGOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Motor Vehicle Rental Company Fee Disclosures
Title
Motor Vehicle Rental Company Fee Disclosures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-02 - House - House/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - Senate - Senate/ passed 3rd reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate/ passed 2nd reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - Senate - Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Senate/ to Governor in EGOV | |
2011-03-17 | Senate/ enrolled bill to Printing in SSEC | |
2011-03-03 | Draft of Enrolled Bill Prepared in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-02 | Senate/ signed by President/ sent for enrolling in LRGCEN | |
2011-03-02 | House/ to Senate in SPRES | |
2011-03-02 | House/ passed 3rd reading in HSPKR | |
2011-02-28 | House/ 2nd reading in HCON | |
2011-02-28 | House Comm - Consent Calendar Recommendation in HSTTRA | |
2011-02-25 | House/ to standing committee in HSTTRA | |
2011-02-25 | House/ received from Senate in HINTRO | |
2011-02-24 | Senate/ intent language in HCLERK | |
2011-02-24 | Senate/ 3rd reading in S3RD | |
2011-02-23 | Senate/ floor amendment in S2ND | |
2011-02-22 | Senate/ circled in S2ND | |
2011-02-15 | Senate/ placed on 2nd Reading Calendar in S2ND | |
2011-02-14 | Senate/ received bill with fiscal note from Print in SSTTPT | |
2011-02-14 | LFA/ fiscal note publicly available in SSTTPT | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Comm - Favorable Recommendation in SSTTPT | |
2011-02-14 | Senate/ to standing committee in SSTTPT | |
2011-02-10 | Senate/ received from House in SINTRO | |
2011-02-09 | Numbered Bill Made Available for Public Distributi in LRGC | |
2011-02-05 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC | |
2011-02-04 | Bill Numbered by Title Without any Substance in LRGC |